THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:15:21 PM
Haig, Cynthia Lee
CPSO#:
52544
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Feb 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Cynthia L. Haig Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 18 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:The charts will be stored at 190 Cundles Road East, Barrie, Ontario L4M 4S5. Marnie at my former office may be contacted at 705-726-8393 regarding release of records.
Date Received: 04 Apr 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1985 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Feb 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2023 |