THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 15:39:46 PM
Mullen, John Charles
CPSO#:
52511
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 May 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
498 Ronning St NW
Edmonton AB T6R 1B7
Phone: 7809026327
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:22 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:19 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN CHARLES MULLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULLEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Research Fellows - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Research Fellows - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Cardiovascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 May 1985 |