THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 22:02:24 PM
Fehlings, Michael George
CPSO#:
52495
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Oct 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: University of Toronto, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Suite 4W-449
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5627
Fax: (416) 603-5298
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Hillcrest Centre |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Lyndhurst Centre |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:19 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL GEORGE FEHLINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEHLINGS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Research Fellows - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 1985 |