THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 23:45:59 PM
Aubrey, Michael Eric
CPSO#:
52472
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 May 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dixon Medical Centre
531 Davis Drive
Suite 307
Newmarket ON L3Y 6P5
Phone: (905) 853-1843
Fax: (905) 853-1863
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Rheumatology |
Effective:03 Dec 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:25 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ERIC AUBREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUBREY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 May 1986 |