THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 13:42:26 PM
Bartol, Stephen William
CPSO#:
52465
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Nov 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Nov 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
A-410 Giles Blvd E
Windsor ON N9A 4C6
Phone: 519-946-1256
Fax: 519-736-1581
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:18 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHEN WILLIAM BARTOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARTOL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Aug 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Nov 1991 |