THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 9:26:36 AM
Callaghan, Denis James
CPSO#:
52438
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
18 May 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Sep 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Denis Callaghan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 17 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Requests for medical records should be directed to Dr. D.DiValentino (92740) @:
685 Main St E
Hamilton ON L8M 1K4
Tel: 289-396-2316
Date Received: 18 Jan 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 May 2021 |