THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 23:36:09 PM
Traplin, Steven John
CPSO#:
52430
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Nov 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 311
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON N1H 4J4
Phone: (519) 836-7861
Fax: (519) 836-8842
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Homewood Health Centre |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEVEN JOHN TRAPLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAPLIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 May 2021 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 07 May 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 14 Feb 2023 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Nov 2023 |