THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 21:23:02 PM
Miller, Judith Ann
CPSO#:
52428
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Aug 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Judith A. Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 22 2014
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Christopher Chan, 8N, Toronto General Hospital, 585 University Avenue, Toronto, ON M5G 2N2
Date Received: 06 Aug 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:09 Sep 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Aug 2015 |