THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 19:11:08 PM
Hynes, Brian Patrick
CPSO#:
52425
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Feb 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON N7T 6S3
Phone: 519-464-4500
Electoral District: 01
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should contact above.
Records Management Ltd.
13-1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Toll free: 1-800-775-0093
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 11 Apr 2019
Instructions/Address:
I am storing my office charts as of June 1/19 at: 13-1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, ON, M9L 0A3
Date Received: 10 Apr 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site |
Petrolia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:09 Sep 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRIAN PATRICK HYNES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HYNES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 1986 |