THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 6:30:53 AM
Sullivan, Hugh Patrick
CPSO#:
52421
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Nov 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sullivan Cardiology
70 Ferguson Avenue North
Hamilton ON L8R 1L4
Phone: (905) 529-8926
Fax: (905) 529-2280
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:29 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HUGH PATRICK SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 1984 |