THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:33:15 AM
Witt-Sullivan, Helga Brigitte
CPSO#:
52420
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Nov 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Witt, Helga Brigitte (used until: 25 May 1983 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: McMaster University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
200 James St South, Unit 104
Hamilton ON L8P 3A9
Phone: 905-528-2564
Fax: 905-527-4126
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Helga Witt-Sullivan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HELGA BRIGITTE WITT-SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITT-SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 1984 |