THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 17:25:10 PM
Heaton, Kenneth John Stephen
CPSO#:
52400
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
301-423 Devonshire Ave
Woodstock ON N4S 0B2
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Kenneth J.S. Heaton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 31 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: July 5, 2010
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On July 14, 2010, Woodstock General Hospital notified the College that Dr. Kenneth John Stephen Heaton's privileges were restricted, effective July 5, 2010 to January 24, 2011.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2023 |