THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 12:56:42 PM
Giesbrecht, Janice Louise
CPSO#:
52396
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Dec 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Walker Family Cancer Centre
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 682-6451
Fax: (905) 682-3391
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:07 Sep 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JANICE LOUISE GIESBRECHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIESBRECHT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 1985 |