THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 0:59:37 AM
Smith, Eileen Marguerite
CPSO#:
52393
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Oct 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite 404
Richmond Hill ON L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 737-9898
Fax: (905) 737-8583
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:09 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EILEEN MARGUERITE SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 1987 |