THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:24:19 AM
Salter, Margaret Jane
CPSO#:
52377
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Aug 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Greg Ryan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 19 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:22 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARGARET JANE SALTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALTER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 1988 |