THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 13:17:33 PM
Rush, Perry Joel
CPSO#:
52364
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 May 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 May 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
285 Cummer Ave
st John's Rehab
North York ON M2M 2G1
Phone: 416-225-0040
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Baycrest Hospital |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:20 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:02 Dec 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:29 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PERRY JOEL RUSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 May 1983 |