THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:59:03 PM
Rayar, Umesh
CPSO#:
52328
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Dec 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Dec 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Canagarayar, Umeshwara Turiyananda (used until: 19 Sep 1985 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Sinhalese, Tamil
Education: University of Ceylon, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Bovaird Pediatric Clinic
Suites 11 &12
965 Bovaird Drive West, Brampton
Ontario L6X 5K7
Brampton ON L6X 5K7
Phone: (905) 497 7779
Fax: 905 497 7707
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:12 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. UMESH RAYAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYAR is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Apr 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 1986 |