THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 16:05:25 PM
Bhandari, Rakesh
CPSO#:
52324
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jan 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jan 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German, Hindi
Education: Indore University, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10 - 14 Lisa St
Brampton ON L6T 4W2
Phone: (905) 452-7111
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital |
Strathroy |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:19 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAKESH BHANDARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHANDARI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 1987 |