THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:43:07 AM
Namis, Nabil Nashat
CPSO#:
52321
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Oct 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Nabil Namis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 19 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Docudavit Solutions
28 Eugene Street
Toronto ON M6B 3ZA
Date Received: 07 Jun 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:04 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1986 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 May 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 02 May 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 2011 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 15 Oct 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jun 2019 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 02 May 2011
Summary:
On May 2, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Nabil Nashat Namis committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. Dr. Namis attend before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register;
2. The Registrar impose as terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Namis' certificate of registration:
a. that Dr. Namis shall participate in and successfully complete, at his own expense and within five months of the date of this Order, an educational program in medical ethics approved by the College;
b. that Dr. Namis, at his own expense, shall participate in and successfully complete an educational program in medical recordkeeping for obstetrics and gynecology attached [to the Order] as Schedule "A", with a preceptor, to be approved by the College in its sole discretion and who has within fortyfive days of the date of this Order signed an Undertaking to the College in the form attached [to the Order] as Schedule "B", and shall abide by all recommendations of his preceptor with respect to practice improvements and/or professional development related to his fulfillment of the educational need and achievement of the outcome set out in Schedule "A"; and
3. Each of the abovenoted terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Namis' certificate of registration shall be removed upon successful completion of the corresponding educational program, as required by paragraphs 2(a) and (b) above.
4. Dr. Namis shall, within 30 days, pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $3,650.00.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 2, 2011