THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 4:42:47 AM
Gervais, Charles William
CPSO#:
52311
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Dec 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
07 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
12-255 Dundas Street East
suite 323
Hamilton ON L8B 0E5
Phone: 905-659-3004
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Gervais Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 15 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
British Columbia
Saskatchewan
USA - Arizona
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:03 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Dec 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 1984 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Apr 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 06 Apr 2022 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 06 Apr 2022 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 03 Mar 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 03 Mar 2023 |
|
Active |