THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:26:48 PM
Vo, Tuyet Bach
CPSO#:
52299
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Aug 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Vietnamese
Education: Medical and Pharmaceutical University, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Tuyet Vo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 2 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:DocuDavid Solution
40 Ashwarren Rd. North York,ON M 3J 1Z5
1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 02 May 2022
Instructions/Address:DocuDavid Solution
40 Ashwarren Rd. North York,ON M 3J 1Z5
1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 28 Apr 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:01 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 May 2022 |