THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 1:59:31 AM
Vosu, Helen Ann
CPSO#:
52252
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
18 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Jun 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Vosu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 18 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:North York General Hospital, 4001 Leslie Street,Toronto, ON, M2K 1E1
Date Received: 18 Jul 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:23 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Jul 2016 |