THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:06:52 AM
Mand, Gurpal Singh
CPSO#:
52248
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Dec 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
29 Oct 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: G. Mand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 7 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jan 1984 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Oct 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 29 Oct 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 16 Jul 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Nov 2021 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: November 18, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Following an assessment that identified issues with Dr. Mand’s knowledge, skill and judgement in his family practice, he underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College continued to raise concerns about his knowledge, skill and judgement in his family practice. Dr. Mand accordingly underwent further remediation and submitted to a further reassessment. The further reassessment report has continued to raise concerns about Dr. Mand’s standard of practice in family medicine. In the face of this further reassessment, Dr. Mand has resigned from the College effective December 31, 2021 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Member
Active Date: October 29, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gurpal Singh Mand to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 29, 2018:
College investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Mand engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his emergency medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:
Dr. Mand will not engage in the practice of Emergency Medicine and will not practice in any Urgent Care Clinic.
Dr. Mand will engage in professional education in communications.