THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:55:57 AM
Toong, Ying Lai Hannah
CPSO#:
52239
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Jul 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin, Swatow
Education: Shantung Medical College, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking to access their medical record can contact: 123 Edward Street, Diagnostic Imaging: 416-597-1016
Date Received: 19 Jun 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Jan 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |