THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:25:18 PM
Wadgymar, Jose Arturo
CPSO#:
52236
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Wadgymar Rivera, Jose Arturo (used until: 23 Oct 1986 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Arturo Wadgymar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 30 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:03 Sep 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2023 |