THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 10:08:21 AM
Walton, John Craig
CPSO#:
52229
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Feb 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: John Walton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2014
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Stratford General Hospital
Department of Pathology
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford, ON N5A 2Y6
Date Received: 21 May 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:13 Dec 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2014 |