THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:54:37 PM
Zoutman, Dick Eric
CPSO#:
52218
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jan 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Mar 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Dutch, English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dick Zoutman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:08 Sep 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:29 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2024 |