THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:32:26 AM
Munoz, David G
CPSO#:
52216
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Mar 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Dec 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Munoz-Garcia, David (used until: 14 Aug 1991 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of Navarra, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Saint Michael's Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5858
Fax: (416) 864-5648
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Vermont
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neuropathology |
Effective:10 Dec 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID G MUNOZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNOZ is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 1989 |