THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 14:41:52 PM
Walker, John Roberts
CPSO#:
52208
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Mar 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J. R. Walker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 5 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:24 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Mar 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2023 |