THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 2:44:22 AM
Malhotra, Kuldip Kumar
CPSO#:
52194
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Mar 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Agra University, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: K. K. Malhotra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 24 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Apothcare Pharmacy
439 Park Street #1
Kitchener, Ontario
N2G 1N4
Canada
1(519) 954-1055
Date Received: 02 Jun 2020
Instructions/Address:Patients should contact Apothecare Pharmacy 439 Park Street, Kitchener ON N2G 1N4 Telephone number: 519-954-1055
Date Received: 18 Feb 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:06 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 May 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |