THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 16:55:57 PM
Lopez, Pedro Guarionex
CPSO#:
52192
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Jun 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Lopez Panningua, Pedro Guarionex (used until: 24 Aug 1993 )
Lopez Paniagua, Pedro Guarionex (used until: 15 Jun 1983 )
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: Queen's University, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. P. G. Lopez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 8 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:HSN Cancer Centre
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury, ON P3E 5J1
Date Received: 01 May 2018
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking their medical record may send a written request to the address above.
Health Sciences North
Cancer Centre
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario
P3E 5J1
Date Received: 30 Apr 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:11 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:07 Sep 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:19 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Hematology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jun 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |