THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:54:19 PM
Lillicrap, David Paul
CPSO#:
52163
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
& Molecular Medicine
Queen's University
Kingston ON K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-6342
Fax: (613) 533-2907
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematology |
Effective:09 Dec 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID PAUL LILLICRAP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LILLICRAP is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1985 |