THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:27:25 AM
Suhadolc, Thomas George
CPSO#:
52118
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jun 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Suhadolic, Thomas George (used until: 29 Jun 1987 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main St E
Grimsby ON L3M 1P3
Phone: (905) 945-2253
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital |
Grimsby |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1983 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. THOMAS GEORGE SUHADOLC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUHADOLC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 29 Mar 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 28 Mar 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1983 |