THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 1:58:38 AM
Syty-Golda, Maria Barbara
CPSO#:
52110
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1447 Upper Ottawa Street
Unit 2
Hamilton ON L8W 3J6
Phone: (905) 529-2423
Fax: (905) 522-2600
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIA BARBARA SYTY-GOLDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYTY-GOLDA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 28 Feb 1983
Other - Rotating Internship
McMaster University, 01 Mar 1983 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 28 Feb 1985
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 1985 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2009 |