THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 18:01:20 PM
Wierzbicki, Rafal
CPSO#:
52081
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Nov 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Polish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Poznan, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Rafal Wierzbicki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa, ON L1G 2B9
Tel: 905 576 8711
Date Received: 13 Apr 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:10 Sep 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |