THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:14:24 PM
Tardif, Gaetan
CPSO#:
52061
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Altum Health
11 Lakeside Terrace #502
Barrie ON L4M 0H9
Phone: 705-726-1113
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Drs. Branigan & Tardif Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 21 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Paitentsd seeking a copy of their medical record may contact:
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
550 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2A2
Tel: 416-597-3422
Date Received: 24 Jan 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Hillcrest Centre |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Lyndhurst Centre |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Rumsey Centre |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:03 Dec 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GAETAN TARDIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARDIF is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1986 |