THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:13:43 AM
Wong, Keith Heung
CPSO#:
52048
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
12 Oct 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Jun 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Keith H. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 31 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Limited
1 High Meadow Pl
North York ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1(800)-775-0093
Date Received: 10 Nov 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Oct 2016 |