THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:42:44 PM
Wong-Pack, William Ki-Fong
CPSO#:
52043
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
12 Jan 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jun 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Wong Young Pack, William Ki-Fong (used until: 09 Jun 1998 )
Wong-Young Pack, William Ki-Fong (used until: 25 Mar 1986 )
Wong-Pack, William Ki-Fong (used until: 24 May 1983 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:24 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nuclear Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Jan 2023 |