THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 5:37:34 AM
Woolfson, Ian Kenneth
CPSO#:
52037
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Nov 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Surgical Centre
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON L1J 0C7
Phone: (905) 7214332
Fax: (905) 721-6665
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:18 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IAN KENNETH WOOLFSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOLFSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Nov 1984 |