THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 6:47:21 AM
Ventresca, Mario Robert
CPSO#:
52019
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jul 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
248 Killaly Street West
Port Colborne ON L3K 6A6
Phone: (905) 834-5611
Fax: (905) 834-5612
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site |
Fort Erie |
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site |
Port Colborne |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:15 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIO ROBERT VENTRESCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VENTRESCA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1982 to 14 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Ophthalmology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Sep 1989
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1983 |