THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:48:02 AM
Lewis, James Franklin
CPSO#:
52013
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Oct 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
53 Cedar St
Paris ON N3L 0A1
Phone: 5196737796
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Respirology |
Effective:23 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES FRANKLIN LEWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 1984 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: September 13, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
James Lewis was found guilty of the following offence:
1. Impaired operation of a motor vehicle, contrary to Section 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
DATE: September 11, 2018
SENTENCE: 1 year driving prohibition; Fine of $2000; Victim Surcharge of $600.