THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 13:42:43 PM
Tamakloe, Barnaby Emmanuel Ahmed
CPSO#:
52010
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 Feb 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jul 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Ga-Adangme-Krobo
Education: Univ of Ghana, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:28 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Nov 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Feb 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: February 9, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Barnaby Tamakloe to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 9, 2021:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Tamakloe failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or is incompetent in his psychiatric practice. In the face of this investigation, Dr. Tamakloe resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)