THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:37:14 AM
Tron, Victor Alexander
CPSO#:
52007
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Mar 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Mar 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LifeLabs
100 International Blvd
Toronto ON M9W 6J6
Phone: 416-675-4530
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:09 Dec 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VICTOR ALEXANDER TRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Rotating Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
CF - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
CF - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Jun 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Mar 2007 |