THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:27:55 AM
Twum-Barima, David Yaw
CPSO#:
52001
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Nov 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Nov 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Twum-Barima, Yaw (used until: 13 May 2009 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Akan, English
Education: Univ of Ghana, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North Oakville Medical
Suite 301
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 337-0040
Fax: (905) 337-0044
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:22 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:09 Apr 2015 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID YAW TWUM-BARIMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TWUM-BARIMA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 1987 |