THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 8:09:46 AM
Teoh, Kevin Hong To
CPSO#:
51997
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jun 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jan 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
30 Prospect Street
Newmarket ON L3Y 3S9
Phone: (905) 836-4600
Fax: (905) 868-8371
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:14 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:21 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEVIN HONG TO TEOH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEOH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Research Fellows - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 31 Dec 1986
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
CF - Cardiovascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 1985 |