THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 8:03:55 AM
Vandenberg, Theodorus Anthony
CPSO#:
51991
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jun 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Theodore Vandenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 29 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:All records are stored on site at London Health Sciences Centre
Date Received: 29 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:05 Sep 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jul 2022 |