THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:35:48 PM
Vandersluis, Rudolf
CPSO#:
51990
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 May 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Sep 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Dutch, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Rudy Vandersluis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 5 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1983 |
CFPC Specialist |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:18 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Nov 1985 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 May 2021 |