THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 15:05:29 PM
Yakemchuk, Valerie Norah
CPSO#:
51977
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Feb 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5280 Lakeshore Rd
unit 909
Burlington ON L7L 5R1
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:25 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nuclear Medicine |
Effective:01 Dec 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |