THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 23:10:42 PM
Reis, Marciano Dias De Oliveira
CPSO#:
51964
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Nov 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Aug 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese, Spanish
Education: Universidade Federal Do Parana, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Laboratory Hematology
University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 11E445A
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 3404800 Ext. 4626
Fax: (416) 3405543
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Marciano Reis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 22 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematological Pathology |
Effective:16 Dec 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARCIANO DIAS DE OLIVEIRA REIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REIS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1992 |