THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 4:46:41 AM
Schneider, Elizabeth Ann
CPSO#:
51960
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Mar 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact Record Storage and Retrieval Services at: 1-888-563-3732.
Date Received: 20 Aug 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:06 Dec 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2023 |